Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1415 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Amended

Bill April 18, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 12, 2024