Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
SCs named Gollihare, Rosino, Haste, Pugh, Stanley, Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 2; Ayes: 67 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Swope
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Rosino; authored by Senator Gollihare
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|