Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1426 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/15/2023

                             
 
 
Req. No. 3224 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
SENATE BILL 1426 	By: Boren 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to income tax credit; amending 68 
O.S. 2021, Section 2357.46, which relates to tax 
credit for construction of energ y efficient property; 
modifying tax year for which credit can be claimed; 
requiring property to be completed in the year in 
which the credit is claimed; updating statutory 
language; and provid ing an effective date . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 202 1, Section 2357.46, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 2357.46. A.  Except as otherwise provided by su bsection 
G of this section, for the time period beginning on or after January 
1, 2006, and ending on July 1, 2016 tax years 2006 through 2016 and 
tax year 2025 and subsequent tax years, there shall be allowed a 
credit against the tax imposed by Section 2355 of this title for 
eligible expenditures incurred by a contractor in the construction 
of energy efficient residential property of two thousand (2,00 0) 
square feet or less.  The amount of the credit s hall be based upon 
the following:   
 
 
Req. No. 3224 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  For any eligible energy efficient residential property 
constructed and certified as fort y percent (40%) or more above the 
International Energy Conservation Code 2003 and any supplement in 
effect at the time of completion, the amount of the credit shall be 
equal to the eligible expenses, not to exceed Four Thousand Dollars 
($4,000.00) for the taxpayer who is the contractor; and 
2.  For any eligible energy efficient resid ential property 
constructed and certified as betwee n twenty percent (20%) and 
thirty-nine percent (39%) above the International Energy 
Conservation Code 2003 and any supplement in effect at the time of 
completion, the credit shall be equal to the eligible expenditures, 
not to exceed Two Thousand Dollars ($2,000.00) for the taxpayer who 
is the contractor. 
B.  As used in this section: 
1.  “Eligible expenditure ” means any: 
a. energy efficient heating or cooling system, 
b. insulation material or system which is specifically 
and primarily designed to reduce the heat gain or loss 
of a residential property when installed in or on such 
property, 
c. exterior windows, including skylights, 
d. exterior doors, and 
e. any metal roof installed on a residential property, 
but only if such roof has ap propriate pigmented   
 
 
Req. No. 3224 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
coatings which are specifically and primarily designed 
to reduce the heat gain of such dwelling unit and 
which meet Energy Star pro gram requirements; 
2.  “Contractor” means the taxpayer who constructed the 
residential property or manufactured home, or if more than one 
taxpayer qualifies as the contractor, the primary contractor; and 
3.  “Eligible energy efficient residential property ” means a 
newly constructed residential property or manufactured home property 
which is located in the State of Oklahoma this state and 
substantially complete after December 31, 2005 completed in the 
calendar year corresponding to the tax year in which the credit is 
claimed, and which is two thousand (2,000) square feet or less: 
a. for the credit provided pursuant to paragraph 1 of 
subsection A of this section, which is certified by an 
accredited Residential Energy Services Network 
Provider using the Home En ergy Rating System to have: 
(1) a level of annual heating and cooling energy 
consumption which is at leas t forty percent (40%) 
below the annual level of heating and cooling 
energy consumption of a comparable residential 
property constructed in accordance w ith the 
standards of Chapter 4 of the 2003 International 
Energy Conservation Co de, as such code is in 
effect on November 1, 2005,   
 
 
Req. No. 3224 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
(2) heating and cooling equipment efficiencies which 
correspond to the minimum allowed under the 
regulations established by th e Department of 
Energy pursuant to the National Appliance Energy 
Conservation Act of 1987 and in effect a t the 
time of construction of the property, and 
(3) building envelope component improvements which 
account for at least one -fifth of the reduced 
annual heating and cooling energy consumption 
levels, and 
b. for the credit provided pursuant to paragraph 2 of 
subsection A of this section, which is certified by an 
accredited Residential Energy Services Netw ork 
Provider using the Home Energy Rating System to have: 
(1) a level of annual heating and cooling energy 
consumption which is between twenty percent (20%) 
and thirty-nine percent (39%) below the annual 
level of heating and cooling energy consumption 
of a comparable residential property constructed 
in accordance with the stand ards of Chapter 4 of 
the 2003 International Energy Conserv ation Code, 
as such code is in effect on November 1, 2005, 
(2) heating and cooling equipment efficiencies which 
correspond to the minimum allowed under the   
 
 
Req. No. 3224 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
regulations establish ed by the Department of 
Energy pursuant to the National Appliance Energy 
Conservation Act of 1987 and in effect at the 
time of construction of the property, and 
(3) building envelope component improvements which 
account for at least one -third of the reduced 
annual heating and cooling energy consumption 
levels. 
C.  The credit provided for in subsection A of this section may 
only be claimed once for the contractor of any eligible residential 
energy efficient property during the taxable year when the property 
is substantially complete. 
D.  If the credit allowed pursuant to this section exceeds the 
amount of income taxes due or if there are no state income taxes due 
on the income of the taxpayer, the amount of credit allowed but not 
used in any taxable year may be carried forward as a credit against 
subsequent income tax liability for a pe riod not exceeding four (4) 
tax years following the qualified expenditures. 
E.  For credits earned on or after July 1, 2006, the credits 
authorized by this section shall be free ly transferable to 
subsequent transferees. 
F.  The Oklahoma Tax Commission shall promulgate rules necessa ry 
to implement this act.   
 
 
Req. No. 3224 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
G.  No credit otherwise authorized by the provisions of this 
section may be claimed for any event, transaction, investment, 
expenditure or other act occurring on or after July 1 , 2010 for 
which the credit would otherwise be allowable.  The p rovisions of 
this subsection shall cease to be operative on July 1, 2012.  
Beginning July 1, 2012, the credit authorized by this section may be 
claimed for any event, transaction, investment, expenditure , or 
other act occurring on or after July 1, 2012, according to the 
provisions of this section. 
H.  No credit otherwise authorized by the provisions of this 
section may be claimed for any event , transaction, investment, 
expenditure or other act occurring on or after July 1, 2016, for 
which the credit would otherwise be allowable. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2024. 
 
59-2-3224 QD 12/15/2023 4:04:09 PM