Senate | 03/11/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Hefner (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Hicks | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |