House | 04/25/2024 | Motion expired | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Lepak | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 35 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Emergency added | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Remove Senator Rosino as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Rader | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Remove Representative Newton as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lepak | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Rosino |