House | 04/10/2024 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |