Senate | 02/14/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | First Reading |