Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2024