Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Archer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|