House | 03/26/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Archer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Garvin |