Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1502 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 19, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2024