House | 04/25/2024 | Motion expired | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Archer | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 44 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Withdrawn from General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Archer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Hall |