Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1525 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024