Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Swope
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants, Roe
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Treat
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Sterling (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|