Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1547 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024