Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1559 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024