House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Hicks | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator McCortney |