House | 04/02/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Coauthored by Representative George (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Hamilton |