Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1587 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024