House | 04/02/2024 | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |