Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1627 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024