Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1641 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024

Amended

Bill April 19, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024