Senate | 03/23/2023 | Motion expired | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Haste | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Measure failed: Ayes: 17 Nays: 29 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Haste | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |