Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB170 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023