Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1701 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 27, 2024