Senate | 04/30/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/30/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 14 | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Remove as author Senator Gollihare; authored by Senator Daniels | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Gollihare |