Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB171 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 20, 2023