Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1711 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024