House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Paxton |