House | 04/02/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Seifried |