House | 04/25/2024 | Motion expired | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 49 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Hardin | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 11 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Hardin | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Rosino |