Senate | 03/07/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Stewart | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | First Reading |