House | 04/18/2024 | Motion expired | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Lowe (Dick) | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 57 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy) | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) |