House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 13 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Jech |