House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Wildlife | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |