House | 04/10/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Paxton |