Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1997 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024