Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB2029 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024