Senate | 05/01/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/01/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz, Alonso-Sandoval | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |