Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/20/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Sterling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Remove as principal author Representative Sterling and substitute with Representative Ford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Rader; authored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Sterling (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rader
|
|
|