Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB26 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023