Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB267 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023