Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 83 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure sent to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Vetoed 05/02/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Boren
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Vancuren (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger)
|
|
|