Senate | 02/15/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Rogers | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Emergency removed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Burns | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |