Senate | 02/15/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Moore | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Prieto | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Pugh | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |