Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB314 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2023