Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB330 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023