House | 04/11/2023 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Dahm | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Alvord |