Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB376 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023