House | 04/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 10 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin |